Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (MIND)

Charity Number: 502995
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 01 February 2008 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 16 February 2005 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 16 February 2005 16 days late