Financial history SHOREHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1148191
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £135.29k £101.10k £105.78k £117.55k £137.69k
Total expenditure £170.29k £118.26k £118.13k £124.94k £140.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A