Trustees THE CONSTRUCTION SECTOR TRANSPARENCY INITIATIVE
Charity number: 1152236

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajiv Lall | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Mwangi | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kittidej Chantangkul | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rincon | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eyasu Yimer | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rueben Lifuka | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Schouten | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETTER MERVYN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.