Trustees MINCHINHAMPTON COMMUNITY LIBRARY TRUST LTD.

Charity Number: 1150061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicole Saunders Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
Stefan Osipiuk Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Carol Anne Lees Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Michael Owen Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Michelle Louise Handoll Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Lynda Ann Alcock Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Linda Jane Fortnam Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
Janet Mary Chamberlain Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record