Financial history TOPS ON STAGE

Charity number: 1150139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.40k £35.33k £7.74k £49.62k £28.69k
Total expenditure £35.67k £37.73k £16.79k £52.69k £23.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A N/A £3.99k