Financial history Small Animal Rescue Coventry

Charity number: 1153081
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.12k £4.18k £9.38k £12.34k £21.88k
Total expenditure £2.86k £3.61k £8.84k £11.57k £16.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A