Financial history THE SHELMERDINE TRUST

Charity number: 1148906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £15.34k £13.14k £12.52k £12.76k £12.65k
Total expenditure £28.08k £27.82k £28.91k £28.09k £27.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A