Financial history PLAYING FIELD, RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 503120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £8.65k £14.56k £26.60k £11.01k £9.55k
Total expenditure £8.05k £8.72k £18.55k £11.64k £16.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.10k £22.60k £3.67k N/A