Accounts and annual returns CI AI EDUCATION FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1149923
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 February 2017 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 20 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 30 November 2014 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required