Financial history CATKINS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1150423
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £53.95k £63.57k £47.17k £68.83k £69.86k
Total expenditure £47.14k £57.81k £58.49k £18.19k £59.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £44.25k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A