Accounts and annual returns SOUTH ESSEX TEACHING SCHOOL ALLIANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1149661
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 September 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required