Accounts and annual returns THE TREAT ME UK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1150913
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 August 2016 On Time