Accounts and annual returns OUR LADY'S PREPARATORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 503214
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time