Trustees THE WEST WOLDS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1149555

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Britton | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Annne Whelan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Rupp | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAY GREEN | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nicholas John Wilson | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA BEARD | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARY BEIGHTON | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Francis | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.