Accounts and annual returns EMPOWERED LIFE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1149556
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 24 April 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required