Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1149977
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 February 2017 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 21 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 14 October 2013 11 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2013 Not Required