Financial history PENNINE MENCAP

Charity number: 1150285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £151.28k £140.60k £200.43k £444.28k £309.32k
Total expenditure £139.56k £44.79k £148.76k £399.04k £359.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £37.00k N/A
Income from government grants £21.96k £35.00k N/A N/A N/A