Accounts and annual returns NEXT STAGE LIFE TRAINING

Charity number: 1150206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 August 2016 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 June 2015 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required