Accounts and annual returns GEMS CHARITY

Charity number: 1151048
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 June 2024 07 April 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2024 07 April 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 June 2023 17 June 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2023 17 June 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 June 2022 14 July 2023 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2022 14 July 2023 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 June 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 June 2020 26 April 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 June 2020 26 April 2021 20 days late Download Open in new window