Trustees POPPETS PRE-SCHOOL (LITTLE WAKERING)

Charity number: 1150078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Dudbridge Chair 14 April 2022
None on record
Amy Freeman Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Charlotte Evans Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Sandra Sutton Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Nicola Aruvera Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record
CAROLE SMITH Trustee 04 December 2012
None on record