Financial history SOHAM MUSEUM

Charity number: 1151345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.45k £8.13k £100 £1.35k £1.68k
Total expenditure £2.60k £875 £584 £2.44k £1.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A