THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEW BARNET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide regular public worship open to all and whilst there is a geographical parish for which we are responsible, our congregation includes many families who come from outside our parish to worship or take part in the activities that we offer. We aim to provide services to the community, located as we are on the main road through the area close by main shops and facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 28 December 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES PCC, NEW BARNET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laura Jane Hewitt | Chair | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Faith Walsh | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Vincent | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Areghan Obawaeki | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Johnson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Fraser Robinson-Beswick | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Isabella Alison Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jean Connah | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUKE RAHUL ALEXANDER COWLES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALUN DAVID MATTHEWS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZOE MIRANDA JONES M MATH ACA | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.85k | £178.55k | £146.41k | £138.75k | £230.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.89k | £143.57k | £125.83k | £148.81k | £210.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
71 East Barnet Road
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN4 8RN
- Phone:
- 07505203260
- Email:
- info@stjamesnewbarnet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window