Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SURE24

Charity Number: 1150945
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 01 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 18 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 18 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2014 30 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 30 May 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2013 29 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 29 April 2014 On Time