Accounts and annual returns K9 Rescue

Charity number: 1152283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 01 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 March 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 03 March 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 January 2022 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 10 May 2021 71 days late Download Open in new window