Financial history DEAFKIDZ INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1151219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £571.37k £694.18k £582.25k £406.09k £567.40k
Total expenditure £317.05k £547.54k £649.33k £561.96k £429.43k
Income from government contracts £15.39k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £66.85k £39.59k £4.51k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £282.36k £689.21k £578.83k N/A £545.87k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £289.01k £0 £0 N/A £18.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £4.97k £2.12k N/A £2.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.29k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k £29.14k N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £317.05k £547.54k £649.33k N/A £417.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £11.82k
Expenditure - Governance £14.63k £13.34k £7.19k N/A £9.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £66.66k £64.97k £78.07k N/A £41.23k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0