Accounts and annual returns FOOTSTEPS COUNSELLING & CARE

Charity number: 1152972
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On Time