THE GOA ANGLICAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide small bursaries for volunteers, who would otherwise be unable take up a volunteer opportunity due to financial hardship. Support in furtherance of the activities of the Goa Anglican Centre in Porvorim, Goa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Mary Holmes | Chair | 24 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Team Rector Tristan David Chapman Revd | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Verity Holmes BA | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Anne Hanson | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL HEFFERNAN ROBINSON | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV ROGER COCKBURN HOLMES | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.68k | £3.86k | £3.87k | £1.53k | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £6.03k | £5.03k | £2.03k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/06/2013
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITIBLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A)PROMOTING ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING VOLUTEERING;(B)PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS TO VOLUNTEER;(C)PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS;AND (D)RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF POOR, SICK, DISTRESSED, VULNERABLE AND UNDER-EDUCATED PERSONS AND COMMUNITIES IN INDIA. (2)THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, DISCRIMINATION, MALTREATMENT, YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, ESPECIALLY VULNERABLE CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bishopgate
Howden
Goole
DN14 7AD
- Phone:
- 01430430880
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window