Financial history THE SHORNCLIFFE TRUST

Charity number: 1152185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.47k £1.68k £6.91k £4.44k £3.82k
Total expenditure £8.99k £2.25k £3.91k £5.25k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.27k N/A N/A