Financial history SLEAFORD METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155287
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £79.48k £103.21k £114.33k £96.67k £104.14k
Total expenditure £88.55k £93.45k £103.11k £106.03k £106.14k
Income from government contracts £71.61k £89.44k £101.70k £81.87k £91.03k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £3.70k N/A