Financial history TESTWOOD LAKES SAILABILITY

Charity number: 1152637
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £14.57k £444 £10.81k £9.96k £19.32k
Total expenditure £13.74k £3.95k £9.59k £12.96k £17.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A