Financial history CDS ACTION

Charity number: 1153270
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £0 £50.00k £50.02k £50.18k £50.56k
Total expenditure £25.61k £39.61k £45.98k £44.77k £44.17k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A