Financial history THE POINT OF CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £669.91k £697.86k £1.07m £1.29m £1.10m
Total expenditure £661.91k £517.99k £636.63k £994.80k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £27.00k £93.76k £18.13k £366.11k N/A
Income from government grants £3.80k £3.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £50.26k £42.97k £90.43k £212.77k £120.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £619.65k £654.90k £976.19k £1.07m £979.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £50.00k £150.00k £120.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £661.91k £517.99k £636.63k £994.80k £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £9.00k £0 £28.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0