Trustees HUTTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity Number: 1151082

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Shaper | Chair | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jean Lee | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corrinne Ann Bartell | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cameron | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Allen Marsh | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Blanche Holt | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marsh | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin John Shaper | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Cowlard | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dennis Sullivan | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bright | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN DAMSELL | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.