Trustees ELLINGTON COLLIERY BAND
Charity number: 1152299

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Toward Watson | Chair | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Elizabeth Suggate | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Brown | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Frost | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Horn | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FREDERICK JOICEY | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN COLVINE BA PGCE | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COLVINE BSC C.ENG | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.