Financial history CASCADE CREATIVE RECOVERY

Charity Number: 1154002
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £69.01k £67.80k £68.73k £78.12k £101.55k
Total expenditure £67.30k £67.02k £65.25k £70.57k £92.74k
Income from government contracts £30.00k £50.00k N/A £75.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.00k £13.24k N/A N/A