Accounts and annual returns BETHANY'S WISH - WILMS TUMOUR CHARITY UK

Charity Number: 1151760
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 March 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 March 2018 22 days late
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 May 2017 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2017 64 days late
Annual return 30 April 2015 12 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 10 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2014 25 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 26 February 2015 On Time