Financial history THE FENIX TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1151830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.55k £13.73k £1.61k £3.25k £5.16k
Total expenditure £994 £9.81k £3.44k £5.77k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A