Financial history THE FARNHAM POTTERY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1152896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.28k £49.01k £75.62k £72.43k £82.40k
Total expenditure £85.09k £42.24k £72.43k £70.81k £78.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k N/A N/A N/A