Accounts and annual returns THE DERBYSHIRE FOOTPATHS PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 503621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 26 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 18 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required