Accounts and annual returns STEVENAGE SPORTING FUTURES TEAM LTD

Charity Number: 1152579
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 24 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window