Accounts and annual returns OUR LADY OF PERPETUAL HELP

Charity Number: 1152235
Charity reporting is overdue by 1596 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
Annual return 14 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
Annual return 14 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 866 days
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 866 days
Annual return 14 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1231 days
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1231 days
Annual return 14 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1596 days
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1596 days