Accounts and annual returns THE NEW HARTLEPOOL MS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1151971
Charity reporting is overdue by 750 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Accounts and TAR 23 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Annual return 23 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 384 days
Accounts and TAR 23 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 384 days
Annual return 23 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 750 days
Accounts and TAR 23 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 750 days
Annual return 23 June 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 June 2021 02 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 June 2020 27 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 June 2020 27 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window