Financial history SAM PILCHER TRUST

Charity number: 1151779
Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.56k £27.27k £48.48k £28.56k £27.91k
Total expenditure £21.57k £20.02k £46.58k £40.95k £37.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A