Financial history UP EUROPE

Charity number: 1153158
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/05/2021
Total gross income £906.73k £873.14k £820.61k £643.61k £249.34k
Total expenditure £916.10k £877.59k £852.35k £678.76k £165.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £906.73k £873.14k £820.61k £643.61k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £916.10k £877.59k £852.35k £678.76k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.72k £5.82k £6.40k £6.58k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A