Accounts and annual returns THE MARK WILLIAMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153086
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2016 29 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 19 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 26 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 26 January 2015 On Time