Accounts and annual returns ANCHORPOINT STOCKPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1154478
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 July 2017 12 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 July 2016 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 26 July 2016 177 days late