Accounts and annual returns THE ONE FEEDS TWO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 27 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 04 September 2024 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 04 September 2024 188 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 12 June 2024 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 12 June 2024 470 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 30 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 30 November 2022 275 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 26 January 2022 483 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 26 January 2022 483 days late Download Open in new window