Financial history WADHURST WARRIORS

Charity Number: 1152653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £26.67k £1.37k £50.75k £44.84k £42.36k
Total expenditure £36.73k £5.12k £29.44k £48.22k £42.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A