Financial history THE BECKIE AND HETTIE CHARLESWORTH MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 503830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £13.76k £13.76k £28.81k £17.27k £28.32k
Total expenditure £10.20k £10.20k £14.41k £36.50k £17.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A