Financial history PETE SPENCER'S HELPING HANDS MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 1152680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £6.77k £2.60k £1.23k £16.81k £1.23k
Total expenditure £11.79k £738 £1.61k £4.15k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A